U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00317-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arroyo-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 23, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 23, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 23, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.