U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02207
  • Case Name: Haughey v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 05, 2023: [Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 03, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • December 09, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 09, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.