U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00321-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 09, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arrest - Other District ]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 09, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.