U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:90-cr-00293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RAYMER, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [SEALED Attachments to Main Document]
  • January 24, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 20, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2023: [SEALED Document]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Case Referred for Screening]
  • December 13, 2022: [Appoint Attorney]
  • December 13, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • December 13, 2022: [Compassionate Release Motion to Reduce Sentence (2255)]
  • December 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 13, 2022: [Add Counts]
  • December 09, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.