U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02159-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ronquillo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.