U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00324-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguilar et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 25, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 24, 2023: [Appear]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 18, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 12, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.