U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00031
  • Case Name: IN RE: JOHN DAVID MATHENY, II, ATTORNEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Declaration]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 13, 2023: [USMS Return Executed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 12, 2022: [Case Assigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.