U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00328-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 17, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 12, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 12, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.