U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ANDERSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order On Probation Petition 12A]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • December 14, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 13, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 12, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.