U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cardena
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 28, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.