U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00501-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDWARDS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Preliminary Exam (Hearing) and Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 16, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • December 14, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 13, 2022: [Oral Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.