U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mann
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.