U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00301-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McWaine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.