U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00296-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Houston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • January 10, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 06, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 06, 2023: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arrest]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.