U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Green
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 10, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 10, 2023: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 06, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 05, 2023: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 05, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arrest]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 13, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.