U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03448
  • Case Name: Webb v. TextBehind
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2023: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • January 13, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 10, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Summons Reissued]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 14, 2022: [Entry of Default]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.