U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00311-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 09, 2023: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 09, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2023: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 09, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arrest]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 19, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 16, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 15, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 14, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 14, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.