U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruceno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 19, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2022: [Arrest]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 14, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.