U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00097-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Keever, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 28, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • December 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 16, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • December 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 16, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2022: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • December 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 14, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2022: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.