U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Delagrande
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • January 19, 2023: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 19, 2023: [Penalty Sheet]
  • January 19, 2023: [Indictment ]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 29, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Text Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.