U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00306-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trujillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • January 11, 2023: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2023: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arrest]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • December 19, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 15, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 15, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.