U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 24, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 20, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 19, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 15, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 15, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.