U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godfrey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 11, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Amended Pretrial Services Report ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 06, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arrest ]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 15, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 15, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.