U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2025
  • January 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 24, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 23, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 19, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 16, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 16, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 16, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.