U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00396-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Arraignment Without Judge Time]
  • December 19, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 16, 2022: [Factual Basis Document]
  • December 16, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • December 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice-Other]
  • December 16, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • December 16, 2022: [Rule 20 - Transfer In ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.