U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saint-Juste et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 28, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 22, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 20, 2022: [Text Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.