U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'Neil, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 13, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest - Other District]
  • January 11, 2023: [Discovery]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2023: [Pretrial Report]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 30, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • December 30, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2022: [Bond]
  • December 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 19, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.