U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00334-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Price
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 11, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 06, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arrest ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 19, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.