U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00333-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 12, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 19, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.