U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beale et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Objection to PSI]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Unredacted Document]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Arrest ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.