U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hilliard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 09, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 03, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 30, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • December 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 19, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.