U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • December 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 19, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.