U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00332-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trowbridge et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice-other]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
October, 2024
  • October 05, 2024: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 09, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 03, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 20, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 20, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.