U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00401-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCDOUGALD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time To File Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 23, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 23, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 23, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Arrest]
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Arraignment and Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • January 10, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 10, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Arrest]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.