U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00402-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WATLINGTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Waiver-Other]
  • January 12, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 11, 2023: [SEALED Pretrial Service Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Scheduling Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 09, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • January 09, 2023: [Oral Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arrest]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • December 20, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.