U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00344-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salas-Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Text Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 21, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 21, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.