U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00340-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ibraheem
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Detention Hearing ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 15, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 12, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2023: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
  • January 11, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 21, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 21, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.