U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03453
  • Case Name: Parsons v. T.A.R.C. Staff
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 17, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 17, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 13, 2023: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Complaint]
  • January 12, 2023: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 11, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2023: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 05, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.