U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bond et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney First Step Act]
  • March 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney - First Step Act]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 11, 2024: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Sentencing ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Restricted Sentencing Statement]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 25, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 25, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 25, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 19, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Arrest ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 22, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • December 22, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • December 22, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.