U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03452
  • Case Name: Littlejohn v. Bullard et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Declaration]
  • January 09, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 06, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 06, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 03, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 22, 2022: [Complaint]
  • December 22, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.