U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03457
  • Case Name: Wilson v. FCC Butner et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 25, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.