U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03454
  • Case Name: Furr v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 12, 2025: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time-Other]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Memorandum in Support]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 28, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • December 28, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 28, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.