U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00032
  • Case Name: NEW HANOVER REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER v. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motions Referred]
  • January 11, 2023: [Case Assigned]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 29, 2022: [Receipt of Funds]
  • December 29, 2022: [Brief]
  • December 29, 2022: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.