U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-hc-02003
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Louis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 04, 2023: [Stay]
  • January 04, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • January 04, 2023: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.