U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-ct-03001
  • Case Name: Moller v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 23, 2023: [Motion Submitted]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 23, 2023: [Document]
  • January 20, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 20, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 20, 2023: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 20, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 20, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 20, 2023: [Hearing]
  • January 19, 2023: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 19, 2023: [Complaint]
  • January 19, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 11, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 10, 2023: [Ex Parte Document]
  • January 10, 2023: [Permanent Injunction]
  • January 10, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.