U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-ct-03004
  • Case Name: Hodge v. Chatham County Parole & Probation et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 10, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 09, 2023: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 05, 2023: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 05, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.