U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-ct-03006
  • Case Name: Watson v. Zimmerman et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 18, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 17, 2023: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • January 17, 2023: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 11, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.