U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-02192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lancaster
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Proposed Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 09, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 09, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Detention]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Unseal Case]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2023: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.