U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:23-ct-03005
  • Case Name: Wallace v. McVicker et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2024: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • October 07, 2024: [Seal Document]
  • October 07, 2024: [PROPOSED SEALED Document ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • October 07, 2024: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 07, 2024: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 07, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 20, 2023: [Case Submitted]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • January 20, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 19, 2023: [Motion Referred]
  • January 19, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 09, 2023: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • January 06, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2023: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • January 06, 2023: [Complaint]
  • January 06, 2023: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.