U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAYLOR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Motions Referred]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.